EP3735774 - MODULAR IMAGE CAPTURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GoPro, Inc. 3025 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENKE, Joseph A. c/o GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 02 /
FLANIGAN, Sean c/o GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 03 /
LEMA, Pablo c/o GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
WOODMAN, Nicholas D. c/o GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 05 /
PATERSON, Michael c/o GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Mark Jonathan, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 19702713.9 | 04.01.2019 | [2020/46] | WO2019US12253 | Priority number, date | US201862614140P | 05.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614140 P | US201815934204 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: US201815934204 | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019136195 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3735774 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3735774 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64U10/13, B64U30/20, B64U50/19, B64U101/30, H04N23/51, H04N23/57, H04N23/66, H04N23/68, B64C39/02, G03B15/00, G05D1/00, H04N7/18 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G03B15/006 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
B64C39/024 (US);
B64D47/08 (US);
B64U20/87 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/0016 (CN,US);
G05D1/0038 (CN,US);
G05D1/0094 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/12 (CN,US);
G05D1/223 (US);
G05D1/224 (US);
G05D1/686 (US);
G05D1/689 (US);
G06F3/04883 (CN,US);
G08G5/0069 (CN,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04N23/62 (US);
H04N23/66 (EP,US);
H04N23/6812 (EP);
H04N23/685 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (CN,US);
H04N7/183 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/185 (EP,CN,US);
B64U10/14 (EP,CN,US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,CN,US);
B64U2201/10 (US);
B64U2201/20 (EP,US);
B64U30/20 (EP,CN);
B64U50/19 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | H04N5/232, A63H27/00, B64C39/02, G03B15/00, G05D1/00, H04N5/225, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE BILDAUFNAHMESYSTEME | [2020/46] | English: | MODULAR IMAGE CAPTURE SYSTEMS | [2020/46] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE MODULAIRES | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 31.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | LU | 04.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2001013890 (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US]); | [XY]JP2002051118 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XY]WO0235824 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2005243173 (LEVINE BOB [US], et al); | [A]US2014024999 (LEVIEN ROYCE A [US], et al); | [A]US2015097950 (WANG TAO [CN], et al); | [A]EP3139239 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [XY]WO2017035840 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [X]US2017178392 (ZUCCARINO TONY [US], et al); | [P]US2018194488 (ZHAO XIFENG [CN], et al); | by applicant | US19600623649 |