EP3740112 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING MULTI-CLAD FIBER FOR SPOT SIZE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iridex Corporation 1212 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/41] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states Topcon Medical Systems, Inc. 111 Bauer Drive Oakland, NJ 07436 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRAMEK, Chris 470 Cypress Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19702715.4 | 04.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019US12274 | Priority number, date | US201815873129 | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US201815873129 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143487 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740112 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3740112 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61F9/008, G02B6/32, G02B6/036 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61B3/0008 (EP,US);
A61F9/008 (US);
A61B3/14 (US);
A61F9/00823 (EP,US);
G02B6/036 (US);
G02B6/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER MULTIKASCHIERTEN FASER ZUR AUSWAHL VON SPOTGRÖSSEN | [2020/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING MULTI-CLAD FIBER FOR SPOT SIZE SELECTION | [2020/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'UTILISER UNE FIBRE À PLUSIEURS GAINES POUR UNE SÉLECTION DE TAILLE DE POINT | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 08.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007274650 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO J [US], et al); | [XI]US2010228119 (BRENNAN JEFFREY [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017049085 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US]) | Examination | US7599591 | by applicant | US7599591 |