|
05.01.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2023 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
394 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
394 |
|
29.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
385 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
383 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.11.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
317 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
398 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
385 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
316 |