EP3781999 - WORKER GUIDANCE SYSTEM, PROCESS SYSTEM, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, MACHINE-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOSE, Sven Goethestrasse 14 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 02 /
SCHOEFFLER, Michael Hirsauer Str. 2 75365 Calw-Altburg / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19703294.9 | 04.02.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019EP52598 | Priority number, date | DE201810206034 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018206034 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201487 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781999 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G05B19/41805 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31027 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31046 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | WERKERFÜHRUNGSANLAGE, PROZESSANLAGE, VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM, MASCHINENLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE STEUEREINHEIT | [2021/08] | English: | WORKER GUIDANCE SYSTEM, PROCESS SYSTEM, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, MACHINE-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT | [2021/08] | French: | INSTALLATION DE GUIDAGE D'OPÉRATEUR, INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT, PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR MACHINE ET UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 20.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102005005266 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [X]EP2052807 (IIE GES FUER INNOVATIVE INDUST [DE]) | by applicant | EP0680759 | DE102015215666 |