EP3744029 - CONTROL CHANNEL MONITORING FOR RETRANSMISSIONS IN A COORDINATED MULTIPOINT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chong 851 JFK Boulevard East, E4 Weehawken, New Jersey 07086 / US | 02 /
LI, Junyi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
GUPTA, Piyush 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
WANG, Hua 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
HAMPEL, Karl Georg 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19703621.3 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019US14552 | Priority number, date | US201862621968P | 25.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862621968 P | US201916253147 | 21.01.2019 Original published format: US201916253147 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019147572 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744029 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (US);
H04L1/1896 (US);
H04L5/0035 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W76/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | STEUERKANALÜBERWACHUNG FÜR NEUÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM KOORDINIERTEN MEHRPUNKTNETZWERK | [2020/49] | English: | CONTROL CHANNEL MONITORING FOR RETRANSMISSIONS IN A COORDINATED MULTIPOINT NETWORK | [2020/49] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE CANAL DE COMMANDE POUR DES RETRANSMISSIONS DANS UN RÉSEAU MULTIPOINT COORDONNÉ | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 24.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2015327275 (KWON HWAN-JOON [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12-19,21-30 * figures 1, 5-8 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0049] * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]WO2017194733 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1, 3-7 * * line 17, page 3 - line 11, page 4 ** line 25, page 4 - line 29, page 8 *; | [X]WO2017220855 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9-14,16,18-20,22,23,25-27,29,30 * figures 1-3, 5 * * line 17, page 1 - line 19, page 3 * * line 36, page 4 - line 19, page 6 * * lines 1-8, page 8 * * lines 17-26, page 8 * * lines 4-7, page 10 * * line 24, page 11 - line 10, page 14 * * line 33, page 14 - line 5, page 15 * |