EP3749196 - HYBRID SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A MAGNETIC RESONANCE TOMOGRAPHY AND A RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION, AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto-von-Guericke-Universität Magdeburg Universitätsplatz 2 39106 Magdeburg / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states Otto-von-Guericke-Universität Magdeburg Universitätsplatz 2 39106 Magdeburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERLACH, Thomas Hanns-Eisler-Platz 2 39128 Magdeburg / DE | 02 /
PANNICKE, Enrico Herweghstraße 4 39114 Magdeburg / DE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Plathnerstraße 3A 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/51] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 19704289.8 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP52896 | Priority number, date | DE201810102965 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: DE102018102965 | [2020/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154850 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749196 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749196 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61B18/08, A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/0036 (US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00994 (EP);
A61B2018/128 (EP);
A61B2018/1293 (EP);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | A61B5/055, A61B18/08, A61B18/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDSYSTEM FÜR DIE DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER MAGNETRESONANZTOMOGRAPHIE UND EINER RADIOFREQUENZABLATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2020/51] | English: | HYBRID SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A MAGNETIC RESONANCE TOMOGRAPHY AND A RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION, AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME HYBRIDE POUR LA RÉALISATION D'UNE IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE ET D'UNE ABLATION PAR FRÉQUENCE RADIO AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 21.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5323778 (KANDARPA KRISHNA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 5 [I] 3,4; | [XAI]US2011301450 (HUE YIK-KIONG [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0039] , [0040] , [0045] , [0051] , [0057] , [0059] , [0063] , [0066]; figures 6,8; claim 1 * [A] 5 [I] 4; | [XI] - THOMAS GERLACH ET AL, "Proof of Concept of a Hybrid MRI-Ablation System", ABSTRACT BOOK 3RD CONFERENCE ON IMAGE-GUIDED INTERVENTIONS & FOKUS NEURORADIOLOGIE IMAGE-GUIDED INTERVENTIONS & FOKUS NEURORADIOLOGIE RECENT PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENTS, Magdeburg, Germany, (20171106), page 15, XP055580789 [X] 1-3 * Seite 15: ID 15 * [I] 4,5 | [XAI] - HUE YIK-KIONG ET AL, "Magnetic Resonance Mediated Radiofrequency Ablation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TMI.2017.2753739, ISSN 0278-0062, (20180201), pages 417 - 427, (20180201), XP011676591 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 5 [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2017.2753739 | [A] - KIM SHULTZ ET AL, "Tissue Impedance Implications of Performing RF Ablation at 64 MHz Temperature Impedance", PROC. INTL. SOC. MAG. RESON. MED., (20120101), page 559, XP055580812 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |