Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021076938 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP52896 | 06.02.2019 | DE102018102965 | 09.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111683594B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2023 | B | CN111683594 | 18.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP52896 | 06.02.2019 | DE102018102965 | 09.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3749196 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | C0 | EP3749196 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | B1 | EP3749196 | 16.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP52896 | 06.02.2019 | DE102018102965 | 09.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019154850 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018102965 | 09.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018102965 | 14.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018102965 | 09.02.2018 |