EP3740221 - COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Bioscience, Inc. 7F, B, 14, Sejong-daero Jung-gu Seoul 04527 / KR | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENSON, Alexander 4D Pharma PLC, 9 Bond Court Leeds, West Yorkshire LS1 2JZ / GB | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP, et al The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19704381.3 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019GB50144 | Priority number, date | GB20180000927 | 19.01.2018 Original published format: GB 201800927 | GB20180001502 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: GB 201801502 | GB20180005941 | 10.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201805941 | GB20180006572 | 23.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201806572 | GB20180008632 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201808632 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019141999 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740221 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,IL);
A61K35/744 (KR,US);
A61K31/337 (US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Extension states | BA | 06.08.2020 | ME | 06.08.2020 | Validation states | KH | 06.08.2020 | MA | 06.08.2020 | MD | 06.08.2020 | TN | 06.08.2020 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG VON KREBS | [2020/48] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING CANCER | [2020/48] | French: | POLYTHERAPIE POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION DU CANCER | [2020/48] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 06.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2023 | 31.01.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.03.2023 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/30] | 02.11.2023 | Resumption of proceedings | [2023/32] | 17.03.2023 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/32] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016354416 (GAJEWSKI THOMAS F [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document ** claims 1, 18 *; | [XY]WO2017085520 (4D PHARMA RES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-14,20-25 * the whole document * * page 14, lines 1-2 * [Y] 1-25; | [XPY]WO2018215782 (4D PHARMA RES LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-4,7-11,14,20-25 * the whole document * [Y] 1-25; | [XPY] - Anonymous, "Archive History for NCT03637803", (20180816), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/history/NCT03637803?V_1=View#StudyPageTop, (20190221), XP055559945 [XP] 1-13,15-25 * the whole document * [Y] 1-25 | [A] - ARTHUR E. FRANKEL ET AL, "Metagenomic Shotgun Sequencing and Unbiased Metabolomic Profiling Identify Specific Human Gut Microbiota and Metabolites Associated with Immune Checkpoint Therapy Efficacy in Melanoma Patients", NEOPLASIA, US, (20171001), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.neo.2017.08.004, ISSN 1476-5586, pages 848 - 855, XP055540712 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neo.2017.08.004 | [A] - BASHIARDES STAVROS ET AL, "The microbiome in anti-cancer therapy", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2017), vol. 32, doi:10.1016/J.SMIM.2017.04.001, ISSN 1044-5323, pages 74 - 81, XP085246126 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.smim.2017.04.001 | [Y] - BRANCH E, "The microbiome effect: Link found between immunotherapy success and gut Flora", AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL REVIEW, RUSSELL PUBLISHING, US, (20170101), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 1099-8012, pages 73 - 75, XP009511455 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "The Gut Microbiome", REPORT ZEUS CAPITAL, ZEUS LONDON OFFICE, GB, (20170307), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://www.directorstalkinterviews.com/wp-content/uploads/2017/03/Microbiome-07032017.pdf, XP009511458 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | [T] - DELPHINE L. LAUTÉ-CALY ET AL, "The flagellin of candidate live biotherapeutic Enterococcus gallinarum MRx0518 is a potent immunostimulant", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20190128), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-018-36926-8, XP055560064 [T] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-018-36926-8 | by applicant | WO03046580 | WO2013008039 | WO2013050792 | WO2014167338 | US2016067188 | WO2017085520 | - SPOR et al., Nat Rev Microbiol, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 279 - 90 | - ECKBURG et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 308, no. 5728, pages 1635 - 8 | - MACPHERSON et al., Microbes Infect, (20010000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1021 - 35 | - MACPHERSON et al., Cell Mol Life Sci, (20020000), vol. 59, no. 12, pages 2088 - 96 | - MAZMANIAN et al., Cell, (20050000), vol. 122, no. 1, pages 107 - 18 | - FRANK et al., PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, no. 34, pages 13780 - 5 | - SCANLAN et al., J Clin Microbiol, (20060000), vol. 44, no. 11, pages 3980 - 8 | - KANG et al., Inflamm Bowel Dis, (20100000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 2034 - 42 | - MACHIELS et al., Gut, (20130000), vol. 63, no. 8, pages 1275 - 83 | - GOLDIN; GORBACH, Clin Infect Dis, (20080000), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 96 - 100 | - AZAD et al., BMJ., (20130000), vol. 347, page f6471 | - STRICKERTSSON et al., Genes, (20140000), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 726 - 738 | - COLLINS et al., Int J Syst Evol Microbiol, (19840000), vol. 34, pages 220 - 223 | - MASCO et al., Systematic and Applied Microbiology, (20030000), vol. 26, pages 557 - 563 | - SRUTKOVA et al., J. Microbiol. Methods, (20110000), vol. 87, no. l, pages 10 - 6 | - HAABETH et al., Oncolmmunology, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 1146 - 1152 | - LEJEUNE et al., Cancer Immun, (20060000), vol. 6, page 6 | - PACE et al., PNAS, (19830000), vol. 80, pages 8782 - 6 | - SGADARI et al., PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 13791 - 6 | - ARENBERG et al., J. Exp. Med., (19960000), vol. 184, pages 981 - 92 | - SGADARI et al., Blood, (19970000), vol. 89, pages 2635 - 43 | - MIYAMOTO-SHINOHARA et al., J. Gen. Appl. Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 54, pages 9 - 24 | - Cryopreservation and Freeze-Drying Protocols, Humana Press | - LESLIE et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 61, pages 3592 - 3597 | - MITROPOULOU et al., J Nutr Metab., (20130000), page 716861 | - KAILASAPATHY et al., Curr Issues Intest Microbiol, (20020000), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 39 - 48 | - STROBEL, Methods Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 581, pages 247 - 61 | - Methods In Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc. | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, Blackwell Scientific Publications, (19860000), vol. I-IV | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - ROCKWELL et al., J Natl Cancer Inst, (19720000), vol. 49, pages 735 - 49 | - BERTRAM; JANIK, Cancer Lett., (19800000), vol. 11, pages 63 - 73 | - DARLINGTON, Meth Enzymol, (19870000), vol. 151, pages 19 - 38 | - SIMPSON-HERREN; LLOYD, Cancer Chemother Rep., (19700000), vol. 54, pages 143 - 74 | - WORKMAN et al., Br. J. Cancer., (20100000), vol. 102, pages 1555 - 77 |