|
02.10.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
07.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2023 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
04.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
04.01.2022 |
|
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2022 |
|
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
15.08.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.08.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
07.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
47 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
72 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Substitute sheet (R26) Request |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |