Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200121315 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53042 | 07.02.2019 | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7230038B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | JP2021514050 | 03.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53042 | 07.02.2019 | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111656097 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53042 | 07.02.2019 | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3755947 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | B1 | EP3755947 | 30.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53042 | 07.02.2019 | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3755947T | 31.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53042 | 07.02.2019 | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019162100 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10865985 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019257519 | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI782176B | 01.11.2022 | B | TW201934927 | 01.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815899439 | 20.02.2018 |