EP3755562 - FRICTION CLUTCH FOR A DRIVETRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING AT LEAST AN ACTUATING SURFACE FORMED BY AT LEAST ONE CONNECTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMERSTIEL, Fabian Pappelallee 1 76189 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
RABER, Christoph Ottweiler Straße 53 66564 Ottweiler-Steinbach / DE | 03 /
FINKENZELLER, Marc Gehren 1 77723 Gengenbach / DE | 04 /
RÖLL, Marcel Haft 35a 77833 Ottersweier / DE | 05 /
VOGEL, Florian An der Kiesgrube 14 77815 Bühl / DE | 06 /
ASCHOFF, Michael Hebelstr. 4a 77815 Bühl / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19704723.6 | 22.01.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019DE100066 | Priority number, date | DE201810103982 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: DE102018103982 | DE201810108046 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018108046 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019161830 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755562 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3755562 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/387, F16D13/52, F16D25/0638 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F16D13/52 (EP);
F16D13/70 (US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
F16D13/38 (US);
F16D13/56 (US);
F16D13/68 (US);
F16D13/71 (US);
F16D13/75 (US);
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D28/00 (US);
F16D2013/706 (US);
F16D2121/24 (US);
F16D2250/0061 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBKUPPLUNG FÜR EINEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT EINER DURCH ZUMINDEST EIN VERBINDUNGSMITTEL GEBILDETEN BETÄTIGUNGSFLÄCHE | [2021/01] | English: | FRICTION CLUTCH FOR A DRIVETRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING AT LEAST AN ACTUATING SURFACE FORMED BY AT LEAST ONE CONNECTING MEANS | [2021/01] | French: | EMBRAYAGE À FRICTION POUR UNE CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE D'ACTIONNEMENT FORMÉE PAR AU MOINS UN MOYEN DE CONNEXION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2019 | AL | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | MK | 19.01.2022 | NL | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | RS | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | SM | 19.01.2022 | IE | 22.01.2022 | LU | 22.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | NL | 19.01.2022 |