EP3810813 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROL OF STEEL STRIP MICROSTRUCTURE IN THERMAL PROCESSING EQUIPMENT USING ELECTRO MAGNETIC SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies USA LLC 5895 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, William, T. 181 Concord Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
STEDGE, John, G. 212 Somerset Circle Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19704977.8 | 28.01.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US15365 | Priority number, date | US201862688081P | 21.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862688081 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019245603 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810813 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C21D11/00, G01R33/028, G01N27/82, G01N27/83, G01N27/85, G01N27/87, G01N27/90, G01N33/20, G01N33/202 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
C21D11/00 (EP);
C21D11/005 (KR,US);
B21B37/74 (KR,US);
B21B38/006 (KR,US);
G01N33/202 (EP,KR);
G01R33/028 (EP);
G01R33/0283 (EP,KR);
G01R33/0286 (EP,KR);
B21B2201/02 (KR,US);
G01N33/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DER MIKROSTRUKTUR EINES STAHLBANDES IN EINER THERMISCHEN VERARBEITUNGSANLAGE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN SENSOREN | [2021/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROL OF STEEL STRIP MICROSTRUCTURE IN THERMAL PROCESSING EQUIPMENT USING ELECTRO MAGNETIC SENSORS | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MICROSTRUCTURE DE BANDE D'ACIER DANS UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE À L'AIDE DE CAPTEURS ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 21.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006117549 (PLOCOENNIK UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11,13-17,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraph [0018] * * claims 1-10 * [I] 2,8,9,12,18,19; | [A]EP2180069 (CONS ENG CO INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2490393 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]) [A] 2,12 * abstract * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP2533067 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2017050311 (SMS GROUP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,11,13-17,20 * abstract * [I] 2,8,9,12,18,19; | [A]EP2702402 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]) [A] 2,12 * abstract * * claims 1-9 * | by applicant | US62688081 |