EP3752053 - TRANSPONDER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR READOUT OF A PASSIVE TRANSPONDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VesselSens GmbH Godesberger Allee 139 53175 Bonn / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Life Science Inkubator Betriebs GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Erhard-Allee 2 53175 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMNICH, Alexej Rottlandstraße 6 53299 Bonn / DE | 02 /
TUTSCH, Fabian Rüdesheimer Straße 26 53175 Bonn / DE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19705514.8 | 15.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019EP53840 | Priority number, date | DE201810202430 | 16.02.2018 Original published format: DE102018202430 | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019158703 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752053 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021, A61B5/00, G06K19/07, G06K7/10 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06K19/0719 (EP);
A61B5/02158 (US);
A61B5/6852 (US);
A61B5/686 (US);
A61B5/6862 (US);
A61B5/6866 (US);
G01L9/12 (US);
G06K7/10009 (EP);
G06K7/10366 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP);
A61B5/02108 (EP);
A61B5/7239 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | TRANSPONDERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLESEN EINES PASSIVEN TRANSPONDERS | [2020/52] | English: | TRANSPONDER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR READOUT OF A PASSIVE TRANSPONDER | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPONDEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE D'UN TRANSPONDEUR PASSIF | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006049796 (CARDIOMEMS INC [US], et al); | [X]EP1990027 (BIOTRONIK VI PATENT AG [CH]); | [X]DE102011009695 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |