EP3774257 - POST CURE INFLATOR FOR TIRES AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AFTER VULCANISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&T Rubber Processing Machinery Chennai-Bangalore Highway Vedal Kanchipuram, Tamil Nadu 631561 / IN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANANTH, Ranganathan Larsen & Toubro Limited Product Development Centre, No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | 02 /
ARUNACHALAM, Muthu Larsen & Toubro Limited Product Development Centre, No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | 03 /
ABHIJITH, Souparnika Larsen & Toubro Limited Product Development Centre, No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | 04 /
KARUPPUSAMY, Ganesh, Raja 37, C Block C1, Morning Glory Vadivudai Amman Street Lakshmi Amman Nagar, Erukkencherry Chennai 600118 / IN | 05 /
ARAVAMUDHUN, Govindarajan MAAS Flats, No: 19 Rajeswari Colony Virugambakkam Chennai 600092 / IN | [2022/43] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
ANANTH, Ranganathan Larsen&Toubro Limited Product Development Centre No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | ||
02 /
ARUNACHALAM, Muthu Larsen&Toubro Limited Product Development Centre No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | |||
03 /
ABHIJITH, Souparnika Larsen&Toubro Limited Product Development Centre No. 67 Appuswamy Road, Redfields Coimbatore 641045 / IN | |||
04 /
KARUPPUSAMY, Ganesh, Raja 37 C Block C1 Morning Glory Vadivudai Amman Street, Lakshmi Amman Nagar, Erukkencherry Chennai 600118 / IN | |||
05 /
ARAVAMUDHUN, Govindarajan MAAS Flats No: 19 Rajeswari Colony Virugambakkam Chennai 600092 / IN | Representative(s) | Swea IP Law AB Forskargatan 20G 151 36 Södertälje / SE | [2022/43] |
Former [2021/07] | Swea IP Law AB P.O. Box 44 151 21 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 19705829.0 | 07.02.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019IN50098 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161726 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774257 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3774257 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/00, B29C35/16, B29D30/06 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B29D30/0643 (EP);
B29C35/16 (EP);
B29D2030/0027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | B29C35/16, B29D30/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASGERÄT NACH DEM VULKANISIEREN UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBLASEN VON REIFEN | [2022/29] | English: | POST CURE INFLATOR FOR TIRES AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AFTER VULCANISATION | [2021/07] | French: | GONFLEUR POST VULCANISATION ET PROCEDE DE GONFLAGE DE PNEUS APRES LA VULCANISATION | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/07] | NACHBEHANDLER FÜR REIFEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN NACH DER VULKANISIERUNG | ||
Former [2021/07] | DISPOSITIF DE GONFLAGE POST-DURCISSEMENT POUR PNEUS ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT APRÈS VULCANISATION | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 28.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | GB | 07.02.2023 | IE | 07.02.2023 | LU | 07.02.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
GB | 07.02.2023 | ||
IE | 07.02.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
GB | 07.02.2023 | ||
IE | 07.02.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 07.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5741528 (AMANO ITARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 20 ** column 13, lines 38-51; figure -; claim - *; | [IA]CN104386039 (BAOKE WUXI TESTING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [I] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11,12,14-18 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3,6,10,13; | [A]CN108312588 (SINO ARP TIRES EQUIPMENT TECH SUZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | CA1104776 | EP0143538 | US5352104 | US2009175975 | CN101544035 | CN201410718Y | US7740464 | US2011189324 | CN102328368 | US8337187 | US8366426 | EP1642695 |