EP3749670 - 5-ALKYLTHIO-7-[(4-ARYLBENZYL)AMINO]-1(2)H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINES FOR TREATMENT OF LYMPHOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerzita Palackeho v Olomouci Krizkovskeho 511/8 77147 Olomouc / CZ | For all designated states Ustav experimentalni botaniky AV CR, v.v.i. Rozvojova 263 Lysolaje 165 02 Praha 6 / CZ | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAVLICEK, Libor Trnkova 1774/20 14200 Praha 4, Krc / CZ | 02 /
STURC, Antonin - deceased / CZ | 03 /
REZNICKOVA, Eva Foerstrova 966/13 77900 Olomouc, Nova Ulice / CZ | 04 /
JORDA, Radek Zelena 577/5 77900 Olomouc, Neredin / CZ | 05 /
KRYSTOF, Vladimir Varsavske nam. 1099/7 77900 Olomouc / CZ | 06 /
STRNAD, Miroslav Zapadni 659/25 77900 Olomouc, Neredin / CZ | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Hartvichova, Katerina HARBER IP s.r.o. Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19705912.4 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019CZ50002 | Priority number, date | CZ20180000058 | 05.02.2018 Original published format: CZ 20180058 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149295 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749670 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749670 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/519 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CZ,US);
A61K31/4162 (CZ);
A61K31/519 (CZ);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K2121/00 (CZ)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 5-ALKYLTHIO-7-[(4-ARYLBENZYL)AMINO]-1(2)H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINE ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES LYMPHOMS | [2020/51] | English: | 5-ALKYLTHIO-7-[(4-ARYLBENZYL)AMINO]-1(2)H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINES FOR TREATMENT OF LYMPHOMA | [2020/51] | French: | 5-ALKYLTHIO-7-[(4-ARYLBENZYL) AMINO] -1 (2) H-PYRAZOLO [4,3-D] PYRIMIDINES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU LYMPHOME | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 31.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2019 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IE | 01.02.2022 | LU | 01.02.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 01.02.2019 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03082872 (USTAV EX BOTAN AV CR I OF EX B [CZ], et al) [A] 1-13 * table 4, compounds 11-91; page 23, line 7 - page 2, line 19 * | Examination | - VYMETALOVÁ LADISLAVA ET AL, "5-Substituted 3-isopropyl-7-[4-(2-pyridyl)benzyl]amino-1(2)H-pyrazolo[4,3-d]pyrimidines with anti-proliferative activity as potent and selective inhibitors of cyclin-dependent kinases", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160118), vol. 110, doi:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2016.01.011, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 291 - 301, XP029415611 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2016.01.011 | by applicant | - ROSENTHAL; YOUNES, Blood Rev., (20160000), page 6 | - KLANOVA et al., Clin Cancer Res., (20160301), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 1138 - 49 | - WENZEL et al., Leukemia, (20130600), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 1381 - 90 | - GREGORY et al., Leukemia, (20150000), vol. 6, pages 1437 - 41 | - CHOUDHARY et al., Oncotarget, (20150710), vol. 6, no. 19, pages 16912 - 16925 | - LI et al., Leukemia, (20150800), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1702 - 12 | - J.Med.Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, pages 2980 - 2993 | - J. Label. Comp. Radiopharm., (20070000), vol. 50, page 225 | - J. Org. Chem., (19750000), vol. 40, page 1653 | - Org. Synth., (20100000), vol. 87, pages 161 - 169 | - AMANDA et al., Soft Matter, (20110000), vol. 7, pages 5627 - 5637 | - Org. Synth, (19550000), vol. 3, page 148 | - Proc Res. Develop., (20030000), vol. 539, no. 7 |