EP3784604 - AN AUTOMATED STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING STATION FOR CHARGING OF A REPLACEABLE POWER SUPPLY OF A CONTAINER HANDLING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/09] | AN AUTOMATED STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING STATION FOR CHARGING OF A REPLACEABLE POWER SUPPLY OF A CONTAINER HANDLING VEHICLE | ||
[2022/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOSTORE TECHNOLOGY AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSTRHEIM, Trond Nedre Teigen 12 5590 Etne / NO | 02 /
FJELDHEIM, Ivar Bjørnebærveien 9 5533 Haugesund / NO | 03 /
FAGERLAND, Ingvar Holevegen 8 5541 Kolnes / NO | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19705963.7 | 15.02.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019EP53875 | Priority number, date | NO20180000586 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: NO 20180586 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206490 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784604 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3784604 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137, B60L53/80, B60L53/14, B60L53/30, B60S5/06, B60L53/16 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP,CN,NO,US);
B65G1/0492 (CN);
B60L53/36 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/16 (EP,CN);
B60L53/30 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,CN);
B60S5/06 (NO);
B65G1/0478 (CN,US);
B65G1/065 (US);
B65G1/137 (CN);
B65G1/1378 (EP,US);
B60L2200/44 (EP);
B60L2260/32 (EP);
B60Y2200/62 (EP);
B65G2201/0258 (EP,US);
Y02P90/60 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES REGALBEDIENUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER LADESTATION ZUM LADEN EINER AUSTAUSCHBAREN STROMVERSORGUNG EINES CONTAINERHANDHABUNGSFAHRZEUGS | [2021/09] | English: | AN AUTOMATED STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING STATION FOR CHARGING OF A REPLACEABLE POWER SUPPLY OF A CONTAINER HANDLING VEHICLE | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈME AUTOMATISÉ DE STOCKAGE ET DE RÉCUPÉRATION POURVU D'UNE STATION DE CHARGE POUR CHARGER UNE ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE REMPLAÇABLE D'UN VÉHICULE DE MANIPULATION DE CONTENEURS | [2021/09] |
Former [2021/09] | AN AUTOMATED STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING STATION FOR CHARGING OF A REPLACEABLE POWER SUPPLY OF A CONTAINER HANDLING VEHICLE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22201412.8 / EP4151558 | EP24183533.9 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | IE | 15.02.2023 | LU | 15.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP0698530 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]); | [A]JP2003118671 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, et al); | [XI]US2016325932 (HOGNALAND INGVAR [NO]); | [XDI]WO2017220627 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]); | [XPA]WO2018210923 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]); | [XPA]WO2018210851 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]) | by applicant | WO2014075937 | WO2014090684 | WO2015104263 | WO2015193278 | WO2016120075 | WO2017037095 | WO2017220627 |