EP3749434 - FILTRATION SYSTEMS, FILTER ELEMENTS AND METHODS WITH WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION AND SEPARATE SIGNAL OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | [2022/49] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | ||
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Danny W. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55440-1299 / US | 02 /
ADAMEK, Daniel E. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55440-1299 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19706222.7 | 07.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US17059 | Priority number, date | US201862627425P | 07.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862627425 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019157187 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749434 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749434 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/42, B01D46/00, B01D46/10, B01D46/52, B01D46/24, B01D29/01, B01D29/11, B01D29/58, B01D46/62 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B01D46/429 (EP,US);
B01D46/00 (CN);
B01D29/01 (EP);
B01D29/111 (EP);
B01D29/114 (EP,US);
B01D29/58 (EP);
B01D46/10 (EP);
B01D46/2411 (EP);
B01D46/42 (CN);
B01D46/525 (EP);
B01D46/62 (EP,US);
F02C7/052 (CN);
F02C7/32 (CN);
F02M35/0205 (CN);
F02M35/02416 (CN);
F02M35/042 (CN);
F02M35/09 (CN);
B01D2201/291 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | B01D46/42, B01D46/00, B01D46/10, B01D46/24, B01D46/52, B01D29/01, B01D29/11, B01D29/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTRATIONSSYSTEME, FILTERELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN MIT DRAHTLOSER ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG UND SEPARATER SIGNALAUSGABE | [2020/51] | English: | FILTRATION SYSTEMS, FILTER ELEMENTS AND METHODS WITH WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION AND SEPARATE SIGNAL OUTPUT | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE FILTRATION, ÉLÉMENTS DE FILTRE ET PROCÉDÉS AVEC TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL ET SORTIE DE SIGNAL SÉPARÉE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 25.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2005113112 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2006060512 (ASTLE ROBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]US2006254986 (HANSON TODD [US], et al); | [A]US2012303204 (NARISAKO HIDEKI [JP], et al) |