EP3755505 - ACTIVELY DAMPED ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOTT, Martin BAE SYSTEMS Samlesbury Aerodrome Balderstone, Lancashire BB2 7LF / GB | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2021/01] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19706304.3 | 19.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019GB50432 | Priority number, date | GB20180002796 | 21.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201802796 | EP20180157901 | 21.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18157901 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019162653 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755505 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3755505 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, G05B19/404 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/404 (EP);
F16F15/027 (GB);
B25J9/1694 (US);
B23Q11/0032 (GB);
B25J11/0055 (US);
B25J13/087 (US);
B25J15/0019 (US);
B25J19/0012 (GB,US);
B25J9/04 (US);
B25J9/126 (US);
B25J9/1602 (EP);
G05D19/00 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIV GEDÄMPFTER ROBOTER | [2021/01] | English: | ACTIVELY DAMPED ROBOT | [2021/01] | French: | ROBOT AMORTI ACTIVEMENT | [2023/24] |
Former [2021/01] | ROBOT ACTIVEMENT AMORTI | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 10.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1001184 (LORD CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [I]US2008277953 (CONDLIFF CHRISTOPHER D [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0061] *; | [Y]WO2013184456 (TECHNICAL MFG CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 18 * * page 7, line 20 - line 27 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 15 *; | [A]US2016116017 (EBIHARA KENZO [JP]) [A] 1,13,15* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0067] *; | [I]US2017014997 (ROHMER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [I] 1,13,15 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] *; | [Y]CN206998973U (SHENZHEN PEITIAN INTELLIGENT TECH RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046] * |