|
13.10.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
18.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
09.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |