EP3632067 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECEIVING TELEMETRY MESSAGES OVER RF CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waviot Integrated Systems, LLC 25 First Avenue SW Suite A Watertown, SD 57201 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORLOV, Andrey Olegovich Novogireevskaya Str, 50/9, Apt. 23 Moscow, 111397 / RU | 02 /
ANISIMOV, Vasiliy Vasilievich 3 Lesnaya Street Moscow, 125047 / RU | 03 /
PUZANOV, Andrey Yurievich Kurchatova Str24, apt. 132 Voronezh, 394048 / RU | 04 /
BAKUMENKO, Andrei Viktorovich Octyabrskiy Prospect Street, 25-23 Moscow Region, Lubertsi, 140002 / RU | 05 /
BATURA, Danylo Sergeevich 16 Borisovka St, Apt. 396 Moscow Region, Mytishchi, 141021 / RU | 06 /
DANILOV, Alexey Andreevich 18 Mokhovaya Str. Apt. 24 Nizhny Novgorod 603146 / RU | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 19706355.5 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/15] | WO2019US16750 | Priority number, date | US201816105706 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US201816105706 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040810 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632067 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632067 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/227, H04L27/233, H04B1/707, H04L27/22, G08C19/12, H04Q9/00, H04L27/38 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H04L27/265 (CN);
G08C19/00 (RU);
G08C19/12 (EP);
H04L27/22 (EP);
H04L27/2273 (CN);
H04L27/2656 (CN);
H04L27/2657 (CN);
H04L27/38 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04L27/227, H04L27/233, H04B1/707, H04L27/22, G08C19/12, H04Q9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/15] | H04L27/227, H04L27/233, H04B1/707 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EMPFANGEN VON TELEMETRIENACHRICHTEN ÜBER EINEN HF-KANAL | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECEIVING TELEMETRY MESSAGES OVER RF CHANNEL | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA RÉCEPTION DE MESSAGES DE TÉLÉMESURE SUR UN CANAL RF | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017210142 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]WO2018126197 (WAVIOT INTEGRATED SYSTEMS LLC [US]) [Y] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2013170464 (HWANG SUNG HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * , entire document *; | [A]CN106100790 (BEIJING GVK TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12* , see machine translation *; | [A]WO2017210142 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * , entire document * | by applicant | US9049732 |