EP3758488 - FATTY ACID DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | Change - representative | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUR, Peter Schulstrasse 5 86938 Schondorf / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Martin Kreuzheck 9 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
HÖVELMANN, Felix Mühlenstr. 13 84453 Mühldorf am Inn / DE | 04 /
BODELON, Luciana Josef-Benner-Weg 19 65934 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
CAMPOS CUEVAS, Javier Kronthaler Str. 7 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 06 /
GIESSLER, Stephanie Schüttenhelmweg 83 60529 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Hans Christoph Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Jacobi, Carola Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 19706631.9 | 25.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP54534 | Priority number, date | EP20180158643 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18158643 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019162484 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758488 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/02, A01N37/12, C07C69/28, A01P13/00, A01P21/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A01N37/02 (EP);
A01N31/02 (US);
A01N25/02 (US);
A01N37/12 (EP);
C07C69/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | FETTSÄUREDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [2021/01] | English: | FATTY ACID DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS HERBICIDES | [2021/01] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE GRAS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS COMME HERBICIDES | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 28.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4975113 (MARRS GORDON J [GB], et al) [X] 12,13 * compound with RN 115687-95-1; the examples *; | [I]US5284819 (ZORNER PAUL S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the claims; the examples; column 2, lines 26-68; columns 3 and 4; column 5, lines 1-53 *; | [X]JPH08157819 (LION CORP) [X] 12,13 * compounds with RN 26940-61-4, 180975-00-2 and 180975-00-2; the examples *; | [X]US2002028778 (AVEN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 12,13* compound with RN 9006-27-3; the claims and the examples *; | [A]US2013231247 (SCHWEINSBERG OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the claims and the examples *; | [X]JP2014218482 (LION CORP) [X] 12,13 * compounds with RN 9006-27-3, 32761-35-6 and 34398-00-0; the examples *; | [A]US8946122 (FOWLER JEFFREY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 13-15 * example 9 *; | [A]US2016102271 (ALLEN DAVE R [US], et al) [A] 13-15 * the claims; paragraphs 38-42; 44-46 and 71-79 *; | [A]US2016168041 (MCKNIGHT GARY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 13-15 * paragraphs 39, 87 and 105 *; | [X]JP6279804B (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD) [X] 12-15 * compounds with RN 34398-00-0, 109909-40-2 and 194289-64-0; the claims; the examples and the tables * | by applicant | DE3810793 | US4975113 | US5035741 | GB2247621 | US5106410 | US5284819 | US5386045 | JPH08157819 | EP0783012 | WO0150862 | US6323156 | US6383585 | US6503869 | US6608003 | US7595291 | JP2011001337 | WO2011161133 | US2012310004 | US2013231247 | JP2014218482 | WO2015004086 | US8946122 | US2016102271 | US2016168041 | JP6279804B | - WINNACKER-KUCHLER, Chemische Technologie'' [Chemical technology, C. Hanser Verlag, (19860000), vol. 7 | - WATKINS, Handbook of Insecticide Dust Diluents and Carriers, Darland Books | - H.V. OLPHEN, Introduction to Clay Colloid Chemistry, J. Wiley & Sons | - MCCUTCHEON, Detergents and Emulsifiers Annual, MC Publ. Corp. | - WINNACKER-KUCHLER, Chemische Technologie, C. Hanser Verlag, (19860000), vol. 7 | - Weed Research, (19860000), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445 | - Compendium of adjuvants for herbicides, URL: www.herbicide-adjuvants.com |