EP3761967 - POLYMER MIXTURE WITH RESISTANCE AGAINST THE INFLUENCE OF ETHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRES, Thomas 1482 Sawyer Run Hoover, AL 35226 / US | 02 /
MEIER, Christian In der Köhlertanne 89 a 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
HERMES, Florian Ecksteins Hof 35 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 04 /
DEL ROSARIO FERRAND, Jessica Friedensstraße 8 64859 Eppertshausen / DE | 05 /
JUNG, Herbert Brunnenstr. 3 63791 Karlstein / DE | 06 /
EURICH, Thomas Sickingenstr. 4 63452 Hanau / DE | 07 /
SCHATTKA, Jan Hendrik Erbacher Straße 89b 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19706689.7 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019EP54817 | Priority number, date | EP20180160836 | 09.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18160836 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019170485 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761967 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, C09D4/00, C09D133/04, C08F220/18 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/5026 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08L33/06 (KR);
A61K9/5089 (US);
C08F220/18 (IL);
C08F220/1808 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08F220/34 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | POLYMERMISCHUNG MIT RESISTENZ GEGENÜBER DEM EINFLUSS VON ETHANOL | [2021/02] | English: | POLYMER MIXTURE WITH RESISTANCE AGAINST THE INFLUENCE OF ETHANOL | [2021/02] | French: | MÉLANGE POLYMÈRE PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE CONTRE L'INFLUENCE DE L'ÉTHANOL | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/02] | MÉLANGE POLYMÈRE DOTÉ D'UNE RÉSISTANCE CONTRE L'INFLUENCE DE L'ÉTHANOL | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 10.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102005024614 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] - [ 0037] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0061] - [ 0079] *; | [I]WO2012171884 (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 1, lines 1-9 * * page 6, paragraph last ** page 19, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US4737357 | DE102005024614 | WO2009036811 | WO2009036812 | WO2010034342 | WO2010034344 | WO2010105672 | WO2010105673 | WO2012171884 | WO2014151797 | WO2015121189 | WO2016193034 | - A. KRIEG; E. ARID et al., "Toward pH-Responsive Coating Materials—High-Throughput Study of (Meth)acrylic Copolymers", ACS Combinatorial Science, (20140000), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 386 - 392 | - Y. ROSIAUX; C. VELGHE et al., "Ethanol-resistant ethylcellulose/guar gum coatings - Importance of formulation parameters", European Journal of Pharmaceutics and Biopharmaceutics, (20130000), vol. 85, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejpb.2013.07.014, pages 1250 - 1258, XP028791007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2013.07.014 | - Y. ROSIAUX; C. VELGHE et al., "Mechanisms Controlling Theophylline Release from Ethanol-Resistant Coated Pellets", Pharmaceutical Research, (20140000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 731 - 741 | - C. Y. GUJJAR; B. C. RALLABANDI et al., "Development and Optimization of a Novel Prolonged Release Formulation to Resist Alcohol-Induced Dose Dumping", AAPS PharmSciTech, (20150000), pages 1 - 8 | - ADLER M. et al., e-Polymers, ISSN 1618-7229, URL: https://doi.org/10.1515/epoly.2005.5.1.602 | - ADLER M. et al., e-Polymers, ISSN 1618-7229, URL: https://doi.org/10.1515/epoly.2004.4.1.608 | - Evonik standard recommendations/Application Guidelines |