Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019209982 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024229100 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916247486 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US202418411772 | 12.01.2024 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021079443 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201917050115 | 24.04.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019218590 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201916247490 | 14.01.2019 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11873524 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2024 | B2 | US2019218589 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916247486 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023182818 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020538028 | 14.01.2019 | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023166568 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | JP2020559422 | 24.04.2019 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021521824 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021511023 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021510508 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3784786 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3737746 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112313337 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111770990 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111757929 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3096281 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3084830 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3083263 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019261608 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019208101 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019208099 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3737745 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020011674 | 17.11.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020011688 | 17.11.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020020622 | 12.01.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020007054 | 09.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US13541 | 14.01.2019 | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020007056 | 09.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US13543 | 14.01.2019 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020011122 | 11.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | WO2019US28967 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019140409 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019140407 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862661739 | 24.04.2018 | US201862628616 | 09.02.2018 | US201862616956 | 12.01.2018 |