EP3737745 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE RAPID DETECTION OF CRONOBACTER USING INFECTIOUS AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings 358 South Main Street Burlington, North Carolina 27215 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Minh Mindy Bao 1864 Wildflower Court Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | 02 /
GIL, Jose S. 20225 Londelius Street Winnetka, California 91306 / US | 03 /
ERICKSON, Stephen 1340 Horseshoe Court White Bear Township, Minnesota 55110 / US | 04 /
ANDERSON, Dwight Lyman 4622 Glabe Lane Minneapolis, Minnesota 55406 / US | 05 /
STACH, Jessica 1180 Cushing Circle Apt. 111 St. Paul, Minnesota 55108 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19706781.2 | 14.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US13541 | Priority number, date | US201862616956P | 12.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862616956 P | US201862628616P | 09.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862628616 P | US201862661739P | 24.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862661739 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019140407 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737745 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/00, C12N15/74, C12Q1/66, C12Q1/70, G01N33/50, C12R1/01 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
C12Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61K35/76 (EP,US);
C12N15/65 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12Q1/025 (US);
C12Q1/66 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
C12Q1/70 (EP,US);
G01N33/50 (EP,US);
C12N2795/00021 (US);
C12N2795/00031 (US);
C12N2795/00051 (US);
C12N2795/10131 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10143 (EP,US);
C12Q2304/60 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM SCHNELLEN NACHWEIS VON CRONOBACTER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON INFEKTIONSERREGERN | [2020/47] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE RAPID DETECTION OF CRONOBACTER USING INFECTIOUS AGENTS | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR LA DÉTECTION RAPIDE DE CRONOBACTER METTANT EN OEUVRE DES AGENTS INFECTIEUX | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2023 | Decision despatched | 16.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5824468 (SCHERER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al); | [Y]US2015218616 (ANDERSON DWIGHT LYMAN [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017127434 (LABORATORY CORP AMERICA HOLDINGS [US]); |