EP3758971 - POWER TRAIN FOR A PEDAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E2 Drives SA Avenue Gevaert 249 1332 Genval / BE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELEVAL, Arthur Kasteelstraat 73 3090 Overijse / BE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 19707011.3 | 26.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP54671 | Priority number, date | BE20180005128 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: BE 201805128 | [2021/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019166402 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758971 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L50/20, B62M6/55, B62M6/70, B62M11/14, F16D41/24, F16H3/72 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B60L50/20 (EP,US);
B62M6/55 (EP,US);
B62M11/145 (EP,US);
B62M23/02 (EP);
B62M6/70 (EP,US);
F16H3/727 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR EIN TRETFAHRZEUG | [2021/01] | English: | POWER TRAIN FOR A PEDAL VEHICLE | [2021/01] | French: | GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR POUR VÉHICULE À PÉDALES | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 31.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016034574 (E2 DRIVES SA [BE]) [Y] 6-8* figure 6 *; | [Y]US2017137086 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0039] - [0042]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0079]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2017217537 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0061]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2017217538 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0067] - [0087]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0116] - [0143]; figures 8-11 * | by applicant | JP2008285069 |