Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11434241 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | US2021061804 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102678805B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2024 | B1 | KR20200121322 | 23.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7316672B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2023 | B2 | JP2021513511 | 27.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111386271B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2023 | B | CN111386271 | 07.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3090945 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019220404B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2023 | B2 | AU2019220404 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3752506 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2022 | B1 | EP3752506 | 23.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020009290 | 01.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3752506T | 13.02.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2939004T | 18.04.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP53711 | 14.02.2019 | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019158655 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3527571 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18156797 | 14.02.2018 |