EP3752506 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universite De Liege Place du XX aout 7 4000 Liege / BE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANCELLOTTI, Patrizio c/o Universite de Liege Avenue de l'Hôpital 1 (Bât. B34) 4000 Liege / BE | 02 /
OURY, Cécile c/o Universite de Liege Avenue de l'Hôpital 1 (Bât. B34) 4000 Liege / BE | 03 /
PIROTTE, Bernard c/o Universite de Liege Avenue de l'Hôpital 1 (Bât. B34) 4000 Liege / BE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19708025.2 | 14.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019EP53711 | Priority number, date | EP20180156797 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18156797 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019158655 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752506 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3752506 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/24, A61P31/00, A61K31/52, C07D473/18, C07D487/04, A61K31/519 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C07D473/24 (EP,KR);
C07D473/40 (KR,US);
A61F2/0077 (KR);
A61F2/24 (KR);
A61K31/52 (KR);
A61K9/0024 (US);
A61L27/28 (KR);
A61L27/54 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (KR);
C07D473/18 (EP,KR);
C07D473/28 (US);
C07D473/36 (KR);
C07D487/04 (EP);
A61F2250/0067 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG BAKTERIELLER INFEKTIONEN | [2022/34] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS | [2020/52] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDINE POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES | [2022/34] |
Former [2020/52] | PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON BAKTERIELLEN INFEKTIONEN | ||
Former [2020/52] | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDINE POUR PRÉVENIR ET TRAITER DES INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 14.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009034386 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [AP]EP3292867 (UNIV LIEGE [BE]) | by applicant | WO2009034386 |