EP3764982 - A COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR HAIR CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER-CRISTADORO, Anna Maria Elastogranstraße 60 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 02 /
FLEISCHEL, Olivier Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
WEICHOLD, Catherine Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | 04 /
KOHLMANN, Christina Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
KLOTZ, Bjoern Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | 06 /
CORNELSEN, Sybille Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19708336.3 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019EP55811 | Priority number, date | EP20180162092 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18162092 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019175041 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764982 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/88, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, C08G69/10, C08G69/48 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/88 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/20 (US);
A61Q5/002 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/10 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HAARPFLEGE | [2021/03] | English: | A COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR HAIR CARE | [2021/03] | French: | COMPOSITION APPROPRIÉE POUR DES SOINS CAPILLAIRES | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10041559 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * example 4 *; | [XD]WO2007060119 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [XD] 8,9 * example 17 *; | [Y]US2008213206 (PHILIPPE MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example - *; | [XY]WO2009150090 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,12 * formulation examples on page 31, lines 8-10; page 32, lines 1-3, 9; page 33, lines 1-3;; example 1; claim 6 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]US2010061953 (LUENGO GUSTAVO [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10-12 * examples 11,17 * [Y] 1-12; | [ID]WO2016062578 (BASF SE [DE]) [ID] 8,9* page 9, line 14 - line 16 * | by applicant | JPS6221616B | EP1563826 | WO2007060119 | JP2007153791 | JP2007169192 | EP2036536 | US2009074700 | US2011123148 | WO2013013889 | WO2015128566 | WO2016062578 | US2017333734 | - WORTMANN et al., J. Appl. Polym. Sci., (19930000), vol. 48, page 137 | - H. FREY et al., Acta Polymer., (19970000), vol. 48, pages 30 - 35 |