Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3773811 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201980019926 EP19708568 EP2019055967W JP2020550140 KR20207027524 US201916981994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12274863Global Dossier 15.04.2025B2
US2021106758 15.04.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018
WO2019EP55967 11.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102446252BGlobal Dossier 22.09.2022B1
KR20200124720 03.11.2020A
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018
WO2019EP55967 11.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7022843BGlobal Dossier 18.02.2022B2
JP2021516584 08.07.2021A
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018
WO2019EP55967 11.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN111867659Global Dossier 30.10.2020A
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018
WO2019EP55967 11.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3773811Global Dossier 17.02.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018
WO2019EP55967 11.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019185335Global Dossier 03.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP18164056 26.03.2018