EP3743736 - LOCATION-BASED FUNCTIONALITY USING ACOUSTIC LOCATION DETERMINATION TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonitor Technologies AS Drammensveien 288 0283 Oslo / NO | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AASEN, Terje 106 Marcdale Blvd. Indian Rocks Beach, Florida 33785 / US | 02 /
BOOIJ, Wilfred Edwin c/o Sonitor Technologies AS, Drammensveien 288 0283 Oslo / NO | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19708664.8 | 23.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019IB50577 | Priority number, date | US201862622448P | 26.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862622448 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145879 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743736 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/30, G01S5/02, G01S5/18 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G01S5/30 (EP,US);
H04B11/00 (US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04W4/029 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | ORTSBASIERTE FUNKTIONALITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SCHALLORTUNGSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/49] | English: | LOCATION-BASED FUNCTIONALITY USING ACOUSTIC LOCATION DETERMINATION TECHNIQUES | [2020/49] | French: | FONCTIONNALITÉ BASÉE SUR L'EMPLACEMENT À L'AIDE DE TECHNIQUES ACOUSTIQUES DE DÉTERMINATION D'EMPLACEMENT | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 25.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017019525 (HANNON MARWAN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 43] - [0046] - [0 48] , [0 49] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0073] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0 87] * * paragraphs [0107] , [ 108] * * paragraphs [0114] - [0116] * * paragraph [0212] * * paragraphs [0153] - [0155] *[I] 9; | [X]US2017154638 (HWANG KYU WOONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0 38] , [0 39] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0 48] - [0051] - [0 53] , [0 55] , [0 56] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0 62] , [0 65] - [0068] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0079] - [0 89] * * figure 5 * |