EP3765575 - ADHESIVE TAPE, IN PARTICULAR WRAPPING TAPE FOR SHEATHING CABLES IN AUTOMOBILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Straße 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEERMANN, Timo Erbschlöer Straße 77 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19708813.1 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019EP54886 | Priority number, date | DE201820101383U | 12.03.2018 Original published format: DE 202018101383 U | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174917 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765575 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/06 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
H02G3/0481 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/20 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2405/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
B60R16/0215 (EP);
C09J2203/302 (EP,US);
C09J2301/122 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,US);
C09J2477/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND INSBESONDERE WICKELBAND ZUM UMMANTELN VON KABELN IN AUTOMOBILEN | [2021/03] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE, IN PARTICULAR WRAPPING TAPE FOR SHEATHING CABLES IN AUTOMOBILES | [2021/03] | French: | BANDE ADHÉSIVE, EN PARTICULIER BANDE ENVELOPPANTE, DESTINÉE À ENVELOPPER DES CÂBLES DANS DES AUTOMOBILES | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 11.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2009086570 (LENZING PLASTICS GMBH [AT], et al) [YD] 1-10 * page 10, lines 4-15; figures 1,2; claims 1,3 ** page 11, lines 14-22 *; | [YD]EP1911824 (COROPLAST FRITZ MUELLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0022]; figure 1; claims 1,3,7,9-11 * | by applicant | WO2005085379 | WO2009086570 | EP2322385 | EP1911824 |