Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.05.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
21.05.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.12.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
18.12.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.12.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
15.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2020 | Change - representative | |
02.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.09.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.09.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
29.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |