Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021000756 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021515789 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111867569 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3092775 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3764996 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020018607 | 29.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 | WO2019EP56016 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019175101 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161432 | 13.03.2018 |