EP3764996 - TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A SILICONE ACRYLIC HYBRID POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstraße 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMGENBROICH, Marco Wagnerstraße 7 53359 Rheinbach / DE | 02 /
WAUER, Gabriel Albert-Federle-Straße 8 53474 Bad Neuenahr-Ahrweiler / DE | 03 /
LINN, Michael Lindenstraße 2 55596 Waldböckelheim / DE | 04 /
BÖHM, Rolf Wendelinusstraße 8 56271 Kleinmaischeid / DE | 05 /
SCHMITZ, Christoph Auf dem Sand 30 56598 Rheinbrohl / DE | 06 /
KAUFMANN, Regine Hermann-Hesse-Straße 6 56567 Neuwied / DE | 07 /
WOLF, Hans-Werner Robert-Stolz-Straße 4 56566 Neuwied / DE | 08 /
REUM, Nico Geschwister-Möhlig-Straße 17 56743 Mendig / DE | 09 /
SCHLÜTER, Anna Villiper Hauptstraße 12a 53343 Wachtberg / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Friedrich, Anja Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Friedrich, Anja Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19708861.0 | 11.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019EP56016 | Priority number, date | EP20180161432 | 13.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18161432 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019175101 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764996 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/465, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P25/26, A61K31/27, A61K31/485, A61P25/04 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/7069 (EP);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
B29D7/01 (US);
B29K2683/00 (US);
B29K2715/006 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM SILIKONACRYLHYBRIDPOLYMER | [2021/03] | English: | TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A SILICONE ACRYLIC HYBRID POLYMER | [2021/03] | French: | SYSTÈME THÉRAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE COMPRENANT UN POLYMÈRE HYBRIDE SILICONE-ACRYLIQUE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP2599847 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [YD] 1-24 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0030] , [0052] , [0056] , [0059] - [0061] - [0063]; examples 1-7; claims 11,15 *; | [YD]WO2016130408 (DOW CORNING [US]) [YD] 1-24 * paragraph [0001]; examples 1-16 *; | [YD]WO2010124187 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [YD] 1-24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0019] , [0020] , [0065] , [0067]; examples 1-22 *; | [IY]WO2018015424 (LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG [DE]) [I] 1-24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0030] , [0036] - [0039]; examples 1-3 * [Y] 1-24; | [Y]WO2014090921 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [Y] 1-24 * examples 1-5 *; | [Y]US6974588 (MIRANDA JESUS [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * column 2, line 1 - line 34 * * column 4, line 44 - line 59 * * example 1 *; | [Y]US5721257 (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * examples 1-8; table IV *; | [Y]US2007128263 (GARGIULO PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * example *; | [Y]US2017112781 (SHIMA TAKITO [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * examples 1-2 * | by applicant | WO2013088254 | EP2599847 | WO2016130408 | WO2007145996 | WO2010124187 |