EP3931388 - A METHOD FOR WASHING LAUNDRY IN A LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE AND LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE IMPLEMENTIG THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AKTIEBOLAG S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZATTIN, Andrea Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
BONDI, Martino Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
ZATTIN, Andrea 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | ||
02 /
BONDI, Martino 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 19708993.1 | 27.02.2019 | [2022/01] | WO2019EP54858 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020173560 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931388 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3931388 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, D06F35/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
D06F39/083 (EP,US);
D06F34/22 (KR,US);
D06F33/36 (KR,US);
D06F23/02 (US);
D06F33/38 (KR);
D06F34/18 (US);
D06F35/005 (EP,KR);
D06F39/02 (KR);
D06F39/085 (KR);
D06F39/088 (KR);
D06F2103/02 (US);
D06F2103/20 (US);
D06F2105/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WASCHEN VON WÄSCHE IN EINER WÄSCHEWASCHMASCHINE UND WÄSCHEWASCHMASCHINE MIT IMPLEMENTIERUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2022/01] | English: | A METHOD FOR WASHING LAUNDRY IN A LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE AND LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE IMPLEMENTIG THE METHOD | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LAVAGE DE LINGE DANS UNE MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE ET MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE METTANT EN OEUVRE LE PROCÉDÉ | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 27.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1688529 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]); | [X]WO2016102011 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]); | [X]WO2018001072 (MIDEA GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN105177923B |