EP3756197 - SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCES OF A CYCLIST ACCORDING TO HIS/HER POSITION ON THE SADDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sense Corporation 1700 Cedar Springs Road Suite 2300 Dallas TX 75202 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEMIGNANI, Silvia Viale Carducci, 21 55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT | 02 /
TESCONI, Mario Via Vallecchia Vecchia, 1 55045 Pietrasanta (LU) / IT | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19709797.5 | 19.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019IB51321 | Priority number, date | IT20180002996 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: IT201800002996 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019162826 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756197 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/50 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G16H50/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER LEISTUNGEN EINES RADFAHRERS NACH SEINER POSITION AUF DEM SATTEL | [2021/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCES OF A CYCLIST ACCORDING TO HIS/HER POSITION ON THE SADDLE | [2021/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DES PERFORMANCES D'UN CYCLISTE EN FONCTION DE SA POSITION SUR LA SELLE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 07.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US8011242 (O'NEILL GEORGE DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014100045 (QI2 ELEMENTS II LLC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 3 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 16 * * page 24, line 2 - line 4 * * page 26, line 26 - page 27, line 10 * * page 29, line 18 - line 21 * * figure 23 *; | [A]WO2014124126 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |