EP3755578 - PROTECTIVE GRID FOR MOTORCYCLE HEADLAMP AND MOTORCYCLE HEADLAMP ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SAID PROTECTIVE GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piaggio & C. S.P.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera Pisa / IT | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAFFE', Francesco c/o PIAGGIO & C. SPA Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19710155.3 | 20.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019IB51362 | Priority number, date | IT20180002890 | 21.02.2018 Original published format: IT201800002890 | [2021/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019162843 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755578 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3755578 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B62J6/026, B62J23/00, B62J27/30 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0005 (EP,US);
B62J23/00 (EP,US);
B62J27/30 (EP,US);
B62J6/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B60Q1/00, B62J23/00, B62J6/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZGITTER FÜR MOTORRADSCHEINWERFER UND MOTORRADSCHEINWERFERANORDNUNG MIT BESAGTEM SCHUTZGITTER | [2021/01] | English: | PROTECTIVE GRID FOR MOTORCYCLE HEADLAMP AND MOTORCYCLE HEADLAMP ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SAID PROTECTIVE GRID | [2021/01] | French: | GRILLE DE PROTECTION POUR PHARE DE MOTOCYCLETTE ET ENSEMBLE PHARE DE MOTOCYCLETTE COMPRENANT LADITE GRILLE DE PROTECTION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | IE | 20.02.2023 | LU | 20.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 20.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 20.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 20.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1734211U (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,13,14 * pages 2-4; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]JPS62113661 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,13,14 * see attached machine translation; paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,7,10-12 [I] 5; | [Y]DE8706415U (SCHLIESSL, JOSEF) [Y] 10-12 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 2-4 *; | [XI]JPH0527902U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,13,14 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0010] - [0014]; figures 1-5 * [I] 5; | [A]JPH11102606 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8,13,14* see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0001] - [0019]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1985913 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014]; figures 2,4-10 *; | [YA]CN201772394U (LIFAN IND GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 7 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] , [0023]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-3,6,8,9,13,14 |