|
16.02.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |