EP3762328 - CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE FOR NAVIGATION IN NARROW AISLES AND METHOD THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargotec Sweden Akiebolag Box 1133 Kronborgsgränd 23 164 22 Kista / SE | [2022/14] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Cargotec Patenter AB P.O. Box 1133 16422 Kista / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Per-Erik Linevägen 3 341 71 LIDHULT / SE | 02 /
ZACHAU, Hans Philip Snäckvägen 24A 414 75 GÖTEBORG / SE | 03 /
BOURGHARDT, Robert Kristinelundsgatan 4 411 37 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/02] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19710810.3 | 05.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019SE50187 | Priority number, date | SE20180050243 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: SE 1850243 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172824 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762328 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3762328 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
B66F9/0655 (EP,SE,US);
B66F9/063 (US);
B65G1/0492 (US);
B65G1/1371 (US);
B66C23/42 (EP);
B66F9/0755 (US);
B66F9/07554 (US);
B66F9/07559 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0212 (EP);
B65G2201/0235 (US);
B66F9/07568 (SE,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | B66F9/065, B66C23/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADUNGSUMSCHLAG-FAHRZEUG FÜR DIE NAVIGATION IN SCHMALEN GÄNGEN UND DAZUGEHÖRENDES VERFAHREN | [2023/32] | English: | CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE FOR NAVIGATION IN NARROW AISLES AND METHOD THEREFORE | [2021/02] | French: | VÉHICULE DE MANUTENTION DE CARGAISON POUR LA NAVIGATION DANS DES AISLES ÉTROITES ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/02] | FRACHTHANDHABUNGSFAHRZEUG ZUR NAVIGATION IN SCHMALEN GÄNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2021/02] | VÉHICULE DE MANUTENTION DE MARCHANDISES POUR NAVIGATION DANS DES ALLÉES ÉTROITES ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 30.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0876292 (KIROW LEIPZIG RAIL & PORT AG M [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6,12,14,15,19 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * claims 1, 13 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO0114239 (BOLSOE ARILD [NO]) [A] 1,2,6,12-15,19 * abstract * * figures 1-10a * * 55: sets of wheels * * 58: wheel carrier * * 141: rotation bearing * * 141b: angle sensor * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 22 * * page 9, line 25 - line 33 * * page 10, line 8 - line 14 * * page 12 *; | [A]DE102004041938 (LIEBHERR WERK NENZING GMBH NEN [AT]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,14-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] * * claims 1, 3, 9, 10 *; | [A]DE102012015217 (CES CONTAINERHANDLING EQUIPMENT & SOLUTIONS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,15 * figures 1, 2 * * 23: "Chassis-Grundteil" * * 26: "Steuervorrichtung" * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]CN104828712 (HOU XUEZHI) [A] 1,9,15 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]JP2016204068 (UNICARRIERS CORP) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * |