EP3737555 - FILLING UNIT AND METHOD FOR FILLING CAVITIES IN A TABLET PRESS WITH A FEEDSTOCK TO BE PRESSED AND MODULE FOR PRODUCING TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glatt Maschinen- und Apparatebau AG Kraftwerkstrasse 6 4133 Pratteln / CH | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOWAK, Reinhard Eggenweg 5 79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
THIES, Jochen Asternweg 3 79540 Lörrach / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB Plochinger Straße 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19711588.4 | 15.03.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019EP56585 | Priority number, date | DE201810204440 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018204440 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179896 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737555 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737555 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/00, B30B11/08, B30B15/30 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B30B15/302 (EP,US);
B30B11/005 (EP,US);
B30B11/08 (EP,US);
B29C43/006 (US);
B29C43/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFÜLLEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN VON KAVITÄTEN EINER TABLETTENPRESSE MIT EINEM ZU VERPRESSENDEM FÜLLMATERIAL SOWIE MODUL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TABLETTEN | [2020/47] | English: | FILLING UNIT AND METHOD FOR FILLING CAVITIES IN A TABLET PRESS WITH A FEEDSTOCK TO BE PRESSED AND MODULE FOR PRODUCING TABLETS | [2020/47] | French: | UNITÉ DE REMPLISSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À REMPLIR DES CAVITÉS D'UNE PRESSE À COMPRIMÉS D'UN MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE À COMPRESSER, AINSI QUE MODE DE FABRICATION DE COMPRIMÉS | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 13.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE818450 (BERNECKER KURT DIPL-ING) [A] 1,12* abstract *; | [A]JPS4837371 (X) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE4437823 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2014234463 (OZEKI YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0063]; figure - * [Y] 2,13 [I] 9; | [A]WO2014207510 (GEA PROCESS ENGINEERING NV [BE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2017282421 (KITAMURA NAOSHIGE [JP], et al) [Y] 2,13 * paragraph [0068]; figure - * | by applicant | DE2157465 | EP3260286 |