EP3776739 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A SHIELD CONDUCTOR OF AN ELECTRIC LINE TO A GROUNDING SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGHAHN, Kevin Wilbaser Weg 3 32825 Blomberg / DE | 02 /
ANDRESEN, Jens Schambrede 28 32825 Blomberg / DE | 03 /
REIBKE, Heinz Elkenbreder Weg 85 32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Graefe, Karsten, et al Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Muth, Bruno Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19712965.3 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019EP56906 | Priority number, date | BE20180005225 | 03.04.2018 Original published format: BE 201805225 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192842 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776739 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R4/64, H01R13/24 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H01R4/646 (EP,US);
H01R13/2464 (US);
H01R13/2492 (EP);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/484 (EP,US);
H01R9/2691 (US);
H01R4/4814 (EP,US);
H01R4/4823 (EP,US);
H01R4/4842 (EP,US);
H01R9/0527 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG ZUM ANSCHLIEßEN EINES SCHIRMLEITERS EINER ELEKTRISCHEN LEITUNG AN EINEN ERDUNGSABSCHNITT | [2021/07] | English: | CONNECTION DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A SHIELD CONDUCTOR OF AN ELECTRIC LINE TO A GROUNDING SECTION | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION POUR LA CONNEXION D'UN CONDUCTEUR DE BLINDAGE D'UNE LIGNE ÉLECTRIQUE À UNE SECTION DE MISE À LA TERRE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3428054 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XY]EP0780923 (HAGER ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE20003081U (LUETZE FRIEDRICH ELEKTRO [DE]); | [Y]US2017125991 (KORCZ KRZYSZTOF [US], et al); | [X]DE102016110393 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) | International search | [Y]DE3428054 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XY]EP0780923 (HAGER ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE20003081U (LUETZE FRIEDRICH ELEKTRO [DE]); | [Y]US2017125991 (KORCZ KRZYSZTOF [US], et al); | [X]DE102016110393 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) | by applicant | DE196108541 | DE19917407 | DE20014918U | DE202015102037U | WO2016166132 |