EP3790630 - AGENT FOR DYEING HAIR, CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND, A COLORING COMPOUND AND A FILM-FORMING, HYDROPHILIC POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECHNER, Torsten Stefenshovener Str. 25 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
NOWOTTNY, Marc An der Holter Heide 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
SCHOEPGENS, Juergen Schulstr. 46 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19712981.0 | 21.03.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019EP57027 | Priority number, date | DE201810207025 | 07.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018207025 | [2021/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214871 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790630 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61K8/58, A61K8/81 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (US);
A61K8/342 (US);
A61K8/345 (US);
A61K8/365 (US);
A61K8/375 (US);
A61K8/39 (US);
A61K8/442 (US);
A61K8/8164 (US);
A61K8/8176 (EP,US);
A61K8/8182 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (US);
A61K2800/4324 (EP,US);
A61K2800/436 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUM FÄRBEN VON HAAREN ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS EINE ORGANISCHE SILICIUMVERBINDUNG, EINE FARBGEBENDE VERBINDUNG UND EIN FILMBILDENDES, HYDROPHILES POLYMER | [2021/11] | English: | AGENT FOR DYEING HAIR, CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND, A COLORING COMPOUND AND A FILM-FORMING, HYDROPHILIC POLYMER | [2021/11] | French: | PRODUIT DE COLORATION CAPILLAIRE CONTENANT AU MOINS UN COMPOSÉ DE SILICONE ORGANIQUE, UN COMPOSÉ COLORANT ET UN POLYMÈRE HYDROPHILE FILMOGÈNE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 10.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10200185 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]EP1532967 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-26* paragraphs [0003] - [0004] *; | [YD]EP2168633 (OREAL [FR]) [YD] 1-26 * pages 28-33, paragraphs 267-283; claims 1,7,8 * | by applicant | EP2168633 |