EP3743989 - AN ELECTROMECHANICAL GENERATOR FOR CONVERTING MECHANICAL VIBRATIONAL ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Rail Limited 7th Floor One New Ludgate 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Perpetuum Ltd. Unit 2 Comines Way Hedge End Southampton SO30 4DA / GB | ||
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states Perpetuum Ltd. Unit 7 The Quadrangle, Abbey Park Abbey Industrial Estate Romsey SO51 9DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASENCZUK, Adam c/o Perpetuum Ltd Unit 7 The Quadrangle Abbey Park Abbey Insdustrial Estate Romsey SO51 9DL / GB | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19713005.7 | 22.03.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019EP57197 | Priority number, date | GB20180004869 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201804869 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019185463 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743989 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K35/02, H02K1/34 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H02K1/34 (EP);
H02K35/02 (EP,GB,US);
F16F15/03 (GB);
H02K7/1876 (GB);
H02N2/186 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER GENERATOR ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON MECHANISCHER SCHWINGUNGSENERGIE IN ELEKTRISCHE ENERGIE | [2020/49] | English: | AN ELECTROMECHANICAL GENERATOR FOR CONVERTING MECHANICAL VIBRATIONAL ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY | [2020/49] | French: | UN GÉNÉRATEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE POUR CONVERTIR DE L'ÉNERGIE VIBRATOIRE MÉCANIQUE EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 28.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002181126 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [Y] 7-14 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US7586220 (ROBERTS STEPHEN [GB]) [Y] 7,8* column 4, line 52 - column 9, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]GB2469347 (PERPETUUM LTD [GB]) [X] 1,6,21-24 * page 6, paragraph last - page 10, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [Y] 7-14 [I] 2-4 |