Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3777196

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Validation statesKH 
 MA 
 MD 
TN 
Examination procedure24.04.2025Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase23.10.2020National basic fee paid 
23.10.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2020Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted04.06.2025
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.02.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20201023
 
Event date:17.02.2021 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:17.02.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:15.01.2021 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:15.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:05.10.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:05.04.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:07.07.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:07.07.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:20.04.2022 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
 
Event date:21.04.2023 
Event description:SEARCH RESULTS DESPATCHED UNDER RULE 164(2) EPC TOGETHER WITH COMMUNICATION FROM EXAMINING DIVISION
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009017
 
Event date:21.04.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:24.05.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 19/91 20140101AFI20230414BHEP
 
Event date:24.05.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 19/436 20140101ALI20230414BHEP
 
Event date:24.05.2023 
Event description:ISSUANCE OF SEARCH RESULTS UNDER RULE 164(2) EPC
Effective DATE:20230419
 
Event date:24.05.2023 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20230419
 
Event date:12.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230601
 
Event date:18.02.2025 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:18.02.2025 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:26.03.2025 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20250219
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:02.05.2025 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:02.05.2025 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED