Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112135801B | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B | CN112135801 | 25.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3093926 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019234570C | Global Dossier | 12.09.2024 | C1 | AU2019234570B | 29.02.2024 | B2 | AU2019234570 | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3765413 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3765413 | 20.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020018763 | 07.06.2022 | B1 | BR112020018763 | 29.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2020012679 | 30.10.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2921055T | 17.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020009582 | 05.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20210381 | 02.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3765413T | 01.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US21781 | 12.03.2019 | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178046 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11001519 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2021 | B2 | US2019284077 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2020002375 | 15.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP20065159 | 30.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 |