EP3765413 - VACUUM REFINING OF MOLTEN GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhongming 4686 Sycamore Dr. Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 02 /
SCHOENROCK, Nicholas, A. 1620 Gould Road Toledo, OH 43612 / US | 03 /
LIN, Ya-Cheng 6155 Broadway, Apt. 5A Bronx, NY 10471 / US | 04 /
VEMPATI, Udaya, K. 25400 Fort Meigs Road, Apt. 16 Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 05 /
IDDINGS, Earnest 13373 Roachton Rd, 3 Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2022/18] |
Former [2021/03] | 01 /
WANG, Zhongming 4686 Sycamore Dr. Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | ||
02 /
SCHOENROCK, Nicholas, A. 1620 Gould Road Toledo, OH 43612 / US | |||
03 /
LIN, Ya-Cheng 6155 Broadway, Apt. 5A Bronx, NY 10471 / US | |||
04 /
VEMPATI, Udaya, K. 25400 Fort Meigs Road 136 Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | |||
05 /
IDDINGS, Earnest 13373 Roachton Rd, 3 Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19713316.8 | 12.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019US21781 | Priority number, date | US201815922539 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: US201815922539 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178046 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765413 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3765413 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/225 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C03B5/2252 (EP,US);
C03B5/163 (US);
C03B5/2356 (US);
C03B5/262 (US);
C03B5/42 (US);
C03B5/005 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUM-LÄUTERN VON GESCHMOLZENEM GLAS | [2022/10] | English: | VACUUM REFINING OF MOLTEN GLASS | [2021/03] | French: | RAFFINAGE SOUS VIDE DE VERRE FONDU | [2021/03] |
Former [2021/03] | VAKUUM-RAFFINIEREN VON GESCHMOLZENEM GLAS | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 21.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0939058 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2002062664 (SCHMITT STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2018002214 (GULLINKALA TILAK [US], et al) |