EP3777463 - DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION (DRX) OPERATIONS WITH FLEXIBLE SCHEDULING OF DATA COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
OZTURK, Ozcan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19713641.9 | 12.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US21873 | Priority number, date | US201862653162P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653162 P | US201916298846 | 11.03.2019 Original published format: US201916298846 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194941 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777463 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3777463 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04W52/02, // H04W72/23 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W76/38 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W76/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISKONTINUIERLICHE EMPFANGSVORGÄNGE (DRX) MIT FLEXIBLER PLANUNG DER DATENKOMMUNIKATION | [2021/07] | English: | DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION (DRX) OPERATIONS WITH FLEXIBLE SCHEDULING OF DATA COMMUNICATIONS | [2021/07] | French: | OPÉRATIONS DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE (DRX) AVEC PLANIFICATION FLEXIBLE DE COMMUNICATIONS DE DONNÉES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]EP3226456 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [X] 1-4,24,25 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] - [0065] - [0067] - [0099] , [0100] * * figures 6,9 * [A] 5,6,8-14,26 [Y] 22 [I] 7,15-17,27; | [XAY]US2018020382 (KIM SANGBUM [KR], et al) [X] 18,19,21,23,28,29 * paragraphs [0268] - [0337] * * figures 2C-2G * [A] 20,30[Y] 22 |