EP3768552 - CHILD SEAT FOR ATTACHING TO A MOTOR VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYBEX GmbH Riedinger Strasse 18 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWBRIGHT, Kent 2240 Loramie Washington Rd. Houston, OH 45333 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Pfrang, Tilman Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19713724.3 | 19.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019EP56752 | Priority number, date | DE201820101575U | 21.03.2018 Original published format: DE 202018101575 U | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179968 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768552 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28, B60N2/838 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B60N2/2851 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/2884 (US);
B60N2/2806 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/2818 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/2878 (US);
B60N2/809 (KR);
B60N2/838 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | KINDERSITZ ZUR ANBRINGUNG AUF EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUGSITZ | [2021/04] | English: | CHILD SEAT FOR ATTACHING TO A MOTOR VEHICLE SEAT | [2021/04] | French: | SIÈGE POUR ENFANT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE MONTÉ SUR UN SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 23.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005002906 (CONCORD KINDERAUTOSITZE GMBH & [DE], et al); | [XAI]DE202004020396U (COLUMBUS TRADING PARTNERS POS [DE]); | [A]DE202016104181U (CYBEX GMBH [DE]) |