|
13.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
17 |
|
25.06.2020 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.06.2020 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.12.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
19.12.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
24.06.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
45 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |