EP3759132 - INDUCIBLE CHIMERIC CYTOKINE RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allogene Therapeutics, Inc. 210 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGER, Andrew Ross c/o Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, New York 10017 / US | 02 /
PARK, Spencer c/o Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, New York 10017 / US | 03 /
CHAPARRO RIGGERS, Javier Fernando c/o Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, New York 10017 / US | 04 /
LIN, Regina Junhui c/o Allogene Therapeutics, Inc. 210 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
VAN BLARCOM, Thomas John c/o Allogene Therapeutics, Inc. 210 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19713907.4 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US20340 | Priority number, date | US201862637600P | 02.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862637600 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019169290 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759132 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/715, C07K14/72, C12N15/62, C12N5/078, A61K38/17 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/715 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/90 (IL,US);
C07K14/7155 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (IL,US);
A61K38/1793 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464404 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464419 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07K14/70517 (IL,US);
C07K14/70578 (IL,US);
C07K14/71 (IL,US);
C07K14/7156 (IL,US);
C07K14/72 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Y502/01008 (IL,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | INDUZIERBARE CHIMÄRE ZYTOKINREZEPTOREN | [2021/01] | English: | INDUCIBLE CHIMERIC CYTOKINE RECEPTORS | [2021/01] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS DE CYTOKINES CHIMÉRIQUES INDUCTIBLES | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 16.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2022 | Observations by third parties | 28.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9802558 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US]); | [X]WO2012138858 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al); | [X]WO2016055551 (CELLECTIS [FR]); | [A]WO2017029512 (AUTOLUS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO8704462 | US4754065 | US4800159 | US5037743 | US5143830 | US5858358 | US5883223 | US6078490 | US6352694 | US6534055 | US6692964 | US6797514 | US6867041 | US6887466 | US6905680 | US6905681 | US6905874 | US2006121005 | US7067318 | US7144575 | US7172869 | US7175843 | US7232566 | WO2013153391 | WO2016120216 | US9434935 | WO2004US05237 | WO2011US00827 | other | WO9802558 | WO2012138858 | WO2016127257 | WO2017029512 | WO2017068360 | WO2018038945 | WO2018094244 | WO2020044055 |